TN SB1323 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-09 - Pub. Ch. 73
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-09 - Pub. Ch. 73
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, changes, from June 30, 2023 to June 30, 2020, the date on which the state palliative care and quality of life council is scheduled to terminate. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 29 and Title 71, Chapter 2.
Title
As enacted, changes, from June 30, 2023 to June 30, 2020, the date on which the state palliative care and quality of life council is scheduled to terminate. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 29 and Title 71, Chapter 2.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-18 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - Senate - SENATE GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - Senate - SENATE GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-09 | Pub. Ch. 73 | |
2019-04-09 | Effective date(s) 03/28/2019 | |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2019-03-20 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2019-03-18 | House | Passed H., Ayes 92, Nays 0, PNV 5 |
2019-03-18 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2019-03-14 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 30, Nays 0 |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Placed on Senate Floor Session calendar for 3/11/2019 |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Placed on Senate Government Operations Committee calendar for 3/6/2019 |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Government Operations Committee |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1495 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-09 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 73