TN SB1322 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-09 - Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 12/1/2020
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-09 - Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 12/1/2020
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires each local law enforcement agency to enter into an agreement with the Tennessee bureau of investigation to require the TBI to investigate any officer-involved shooting that occurs within the jurisdiction of the law enforcement agency. - Amends TCA Title 8, Chapter 6; Title 8, Chapter 7 and Title 38.
Title
As introduced, requires each local law enforcement agency to enter into an agreement with the Tennessee bureau of investigation to require the TBI to investigate any officer-involved shooting that occurs within the jurisdiction of the law enforcement agency. - Amends TCA Title 8, Chapter 6; Title 8, Chapter 7 and Title 38.
Sponsors
Sen. Sara Kyle [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-09 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 12/1/2020 |
2020-06-08 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 6/9/2020 |
2020-06-02 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 6/9/2020 |
2020-06-01 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 6/2/2020 |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1471 (Crossfiled) 2020-06-15 - Reset on Final cal. of Calendar & Rules Committee