TN SB1321 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-09 - Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 12/1/2020
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-09 - Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 12/1/2020
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, creates Class E felony of law enforcement officer operating a law enforcement body camera in any manner that would prevent the creation of evidence with the intent to obstruct justice. - Amends TCA Title 10 and Title 39.
Title
As introduced, creates Class E felony of law enforcement officer operating a law enforcement body camera in any manner that would prevent the creation of evidence with the intent to obstruct justice. - Amends TCA Title 10 and Title 39.
Sponsors
Sen. Sara Kyle [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-09 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 12/1/2020 |
2020-06-08 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 6/9/2020 |
2020-06-02 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 6/9/2020 |
2020-06-01 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 6/2/2020 |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1475 (Crossfiled) 2020-05-27 - Failed for lack of second in: Criminal Justice Subcommittee