TN SB1318 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-16 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State and Local Government Committee
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-16 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State and Local Government Committee
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, permits the use of a photo identification card issued by this state, the United States, or an accredited postsecondary institution of education in this state for purposes of verifying the identity of an eligible voter. - Amends TCA Title 2, Chapter 7.
Title
As introduced, permits the use of a photo identification card issued by this state, the United States, or an accredited postsecondary institution of education in this state for purposes of verifying the identity of an eligible voter. - Amends TCA Title 2, Chapter 7.
Sponsors
Sen. Sara Kyle [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-16 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 4/16/2019 |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Reset on Final calendar of Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/5/2019 |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1477 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-03 - Failed in s/c Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee of Local Committee