TN SB1318 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 14 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-02 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. S&L Govt. Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-02 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. S&L Govt. Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, prohibits certain governmental entities from regulating prices for passenger transportation services. - Amends TCA Title 7, Chapter 51, Part 10.
Title
As introduced, prohibits certain governmental entities from regulating prices for passenger transportation services. - Amends TCA Title 7, Chapter 51, Part 10.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-02 | Senate | Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. S&L Govt. Comm. |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Placed on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 4/2/2013 |
2013-02-25 | Senate | P2C, ref. to S. S&L Govt. Comm. |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Intro., P1C. |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1309 (Crossfiled) 2013-03-26 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Transportation Subcommittee of Transportation Committee
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB1318&ga=108 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/108/Bill/SB1318.pdf |