TN SB1316 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-11 - Failed in Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-11 - Failed in Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, creates the state government advisory task force on extreme weather. - Amends TCA Title 4 and Title 68.
Title
As introduced, creates the state government advisory task force on extreme weather. - Amends TCA Title 4 and Title 68.
Sponsors
Sen. Jeff Yarbro [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-11 - Senate - SENATE STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Failed in Senate State and Local Government Committee (Y: 2 N: 2 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-11 | Senate | Failed in Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 4/11/2017 |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 4/11/2017 |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 4/5/2017 |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 4/5/2017 |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 4/4/2017 |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Refer to Senate State & Local Government Committee |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Failed in Senate Government Operations Committee (no second) |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Placed on Senate Government Operations Committee calendar for 3/29/2017 |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Government Operations Committee |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1270 (Crossfiled) 2017-04-12 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c State Government Subcommittee of State Government Committee