TN SB1316 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 26 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-26 - Pub. Ch. 477
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, creates Class C felony offense of aggravated vehicular assault, which is vehicular assault with certain aggravating factors such as prior convictions for alcohol-related traffic offenses or a high blood alcohol concentration. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 13, Part 1.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, creates Class C felony offense of aggravated vehicular assault, which is vehicular assault with certain aggravating factors such as prior convictions for alcohol-related traffic offenses or a high blood alcohol concentration. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 13, Part 1.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-04-22 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-13 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-08 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS, AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-17 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-05-26 Pub. Ch. 477
2015-05-26 Effective date(s) 07/01/2015
2015-05-18SenateSigned by Governor.
2015-05-08SenateTransmitted to Governor for action.
2015-05-08HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2015-05-07SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2015-04-28SenateEnrolled and ready for signatures
2015-04-22HousePassed H., Ayes 92, Nays 0, PNV 0
2015-04-22HouseSubst. for comp. HB.
2015-04-15HouseRcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
2015-04-13SenateEngrossed; ready for transmission to House
2015-04-13SenatePassed Senate, Ayes 33, Nays 0
2015-04-10SenatePlaced on Senate Consent Calendar 2 calendar for 4/13/2015
2015-04-08SenateRecommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
2015-04-08SenatePlaced on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/8/2015
2015-04-07SenateAction deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/8/2015
2015-04-01SenatePlaced on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/7/2015
2015-03-17SenateRecommended for passage, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
2015-03-11SenatePlaced on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/17/2015
2015-02-18SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
2015-02-12SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2015-02-12SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0120 (Crossfiled) 2015-05-26 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 477

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback