TN SB1316 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-02 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. S&L Govt. Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, prohibits a municipality from annexing any land within its urban growth boundary that is zoned for agricultural use until there is a change in use triggered by a request for a non-agricultural zoning designation or by sale of the territory for use other than agricultural purposes. - Amends TCA Title 6.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, prohibits a municipality from annexing any land within its urban growth boundary that is zoned for agricultural use until there is a change in use triggered by a request for a non-agricultural zoning designation or by sale of the territory for use other than agricultural purposes. - Amends TCA Title 6.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-04-02SenateAssigned to Gen. Sub of: S. S&L Govt. Comm.
2013-04-02SenateAction Def. in S. S&L Govt. Comm. to 4/9/2013
2013-03-27SenatePlaced on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 4/2/2013
2013-03-27SenateAction Def. in S. S&L Govt. Comm. to 4/2/2013
2013-03-20SenatePlaced on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 3/27/2013
2013-02-25SenateP2C, ref. to S. S&L Govt. Comm.
2013-02-21SenateIntro., P1C.
2013-02-14SenateFiled for intro.

Same As/Similar To

HB1249 (Crossfiled) 2014-02-20 - Withdrawn.

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback