TN SB1316 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-24 - P2C, ref. to S. S&L Govt. Comm.
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, limits increase in value of certain real property. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 5.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, limits increase in value of certain real property. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 5.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2011-02-24 P2C, ref. to S. S&L Govt. Comm.
2011-02-23 Intro., P1C.
2011-02-16 Filed for intro.

Same As/Similar To

HB1821 (Crossfiled) 2011-03-01 - Assigned to s/c General Sub of S&LG

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback