TN SB1311 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-11 - Action deferred in Senate Health and Welfare Committee to 3/25/2020
Pending: Senate Health and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-11 - Action deferred in Senate Health and Welfare Committee to 3/25/2020
Pending: Senate Health and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires the department to conduct an exit interview with the administrator of a home care organization after a licensure survey is performed to allow the administrator the opportunity to discuss the department's findings. - Amends TCA Title 33 and Title 68.
Title
As introduced, requires the department to conduct an exit interview with the administrator of a home care organization after a licensure survey is performed to allow the administrator the opportunity to discuss the department's findings. - Amends TCA Title 33 and Title 68.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-11 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Health and Welfare Committee to 3/25/2020 |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/11/2020 |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Health and Welfare Committee to 3/11/2020 |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/9/2020 |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Health and Welfare Committee |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1470 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-10 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Facilities, Licensure, & Regulations Subcommittee of Health Committee