TN SB1308 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-03-30 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, prohibits an employer from requiring an employee to receive an immunization or vaccination for COVID-19 against the will of the employee as a condition of maintaining employment; prohibits the employer from taking adverse action against an employee refusing such immunization or vaccination. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 8; Title 50 and Title 68.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4; Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 8; Title 50 and Title 68, relative to employment.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-30SenateAssigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
2021-03-24SenatePlaced on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/30/2021
2021-02-22SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
2021-02-11SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2021-02-11SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB1147 (Crossfiled) 2021-03-24 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Banking & Consumer Affairs Subcommittee of Commerce Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback