TN SB1305 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-19 - Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/23/2024
Pending: Senate Finance, Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, enacts the "Tennessee Special Educator Scholarship Act." - Amends TCA Title 49.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 49, relative to special education.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2024-04-19SenatePlaced on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/23/2024
2024-04-11SenatePlaced on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/15/2024
2023-04-13SenatePlaced on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/20/2023
2023-03-09SenateSponsor(s) Added.
2023-03-08SenateRecommended for passage, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
2023-03-01SenatePlaced on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/8/2023
2023-02-22SenateAction deferred in Senate Education Committee to 3/8/2023
2023-02-15SenatePlaced on Senate Education Committee calendar for 2/22/2023
2023-02-06SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee
2023-02-02SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2023-01-31SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0251 (Crossfiled) 2023-04-18 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways, and Means Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback