TN SB1304 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-01-14 - Companion House Bill substituted
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, prohibits a private licensed child-placing agency from being required to perform, assist, consent to, refer, or participate in any child placement for foster care or adoption that would violate the agency's written religious or moral convictions. - Amends TCA Title 36, Chapter 1, Part 1.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, prohibits a private licensed child-placing agency from being required to perform, assist, consent to, refer, or participate in any child placement for foster care or adoption that would violate the agency's written religious or moral convictions. - Amends TCA Title 36, Chapter 1, Part 1.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-14SenateCompanion House Bill substituted
2020-01-10SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar for 1/14/2020
2019-04-30SenateSenate Reset on first calendar of 2020
2019-04-25SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/30/2019
2019-04-23SenateRecommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 6, Nays 2 PNV 0
2019-04-17SenatePlaced on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/23/2019
2019-04-02SenateReset on Final calendar of Senate Judiciary Committee
2019-03-27SenatePlaced on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/2/2019
2019-03-26SenateAction deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 4/2/2019
2019-03-20SenatePlaced on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/26/2019
2019-02-11SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
2019-02-07SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2019-02-07SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0836 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-24 - Signed by Governor.

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback