TN SB1291 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-17 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Government Operations Committee
Pending: Senate Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, eliminates the requirement of a certificate of need for healthcare facilities; removes references to the certificate of need; terminates the Tennessee health services and development agency. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 34; Title 42; Title 56; Title 63; Title 68 and Title 71.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, eliminates the requirement of a certificate of need for healthcare facilities; removes references to the certificate of need; terminates the Tennessee health services and development agency. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 34; Title 42; Title 56; Title 63; Title 68 and Title 71.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-17SenateAssigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Government Operations Committee
2019-04-10SenatePlaced on Senate Government Operations Committee calendar for 4/17/2019
2019-02-11SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Government Operations Committee
2019-02-07SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2019-02-07SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB1085 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-17 - Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/25/2019

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback