TN SB1289 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-11 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-11 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, changes from March 1 to February 15 of each year the date by which the department of safety shall report to the speakers of the senate and the house of representatives and the chairs of the appropriate committees a report detailing seizures for the previous calendar year. - Amends TCA Title 40, Chapter 33.
Title
As introduced, changes from March 1 to February 15 of each year the date by which the department of safety shall report to the speakers of the senate and the house of representatives and the chairs of the appropriate committees a report detailing seizures for the previous calendar year. - Amends TCA Title 40, Chapter 33.
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Pody [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-11 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0862 (Crossfiled) 2020-06-17 - H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 6/18/2020