TN SB1288 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-23 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1030
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-23 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1030
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, increases the authorized annual state contribution made to human resources agencies. - Amends TCA Title 13, Chapter 26.
Title
As enacted, increases the authorized annual state contribution made to human resources agencies. - Amends TCA Title 13, Chapter 26.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-24 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS, AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-11 - Senate - SENATE STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-11 - Senate - SENATE STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-23 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1030 | |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar 2 calendar for 4/24/2018 |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/24/2018 |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways & Means Committee to 4/24/2018 |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/23/2018 |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Rule #83(8) Suspended, to be heard in S. FW&M Comm. |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 5/9/2017 |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 5/8/2017 |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 5/3/2017 |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 5/3/2017 |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 5/2/2017 |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 5/2/2017 |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 5/1/2017 |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 4/11/2017 |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Rule #83(8) Suspended, to be heard in S. S&L Govt. Comm 4-11-17 |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 3/28/2017 |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/21/2017 |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 3/21/2017 |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/7/2017 |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0955 (Crossfiled) 2018-05-23 - Pub. Ch. 1030