TN SB1281 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on June 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-02 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 557
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on June 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-02 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 557
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, enacts the "Tennessee Health Services and Planning Act of 2021," which revises various provisions of and renames the Tennessee Health Services and Planning Act of 2002. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 56; Title 68 and Title 71.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4; Title 56; Title 68 and Title 71, relative to certificates of need.
Sponsors
Sen. Shane Reeves [R] | Sen. Edward Jackson [R] | Sen. Page Walley [R] | Sen. Bo Watson [R] |
Sen. Todd Gardenhire [R] | Sen. Becky Massey [R] | Sen. John Stevens [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-04 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 9, Nays 1 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - Senate - SENATE HEALTH AND WELFARE COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 7, Nays 2 PNV 0 (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - Senate - SENATE HEALTH AND WELFARE COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 7, Nays 2 PNV 0 (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-02 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 557 | |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 5/5/2021 |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar 2 for 5/4/2021 |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee, Ayes 9, Nays 1 |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 5/4/2021 |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 5/4/2021 |
2021-04-30 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 5/3/2021 |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 5/3/2021 |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/28/2021 |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/28/2021 |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/27/2021 |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Rule #83(8) Suspended, to be heard in S. FW&M Comm. 4/27/21 |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 7, Nays 2 PNV 0 |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/17/2021 |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Health and Welfare Committee to 3/17/2021 |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/10/2021 |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Refer to Senate Health & Welfare Committee |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Recalled from Senate Commerce & Labor Committee |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0948 (Crossfiled) 2021-06-02 - Effective date(s) 05/26/2021, 10/01/2021