TN SB1277 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Effective date(s) 05/11/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Effective date(s) 05/11/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, creates the chronic weight management task force to study the health implications of chronic weight management and Type 2 diabetes. - Amends TCA Title 3; Title 4; Title 56, Chapter 1, Part 1 and Title 63.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 3; Title 4; Title 56, Chapter 1, Part 1 and Title 63, relative to the chronic weight management task force.
Sponsors
Sen. Shane Reeves [R] | Sen. Janince Bowling [R] | Sen. Joseph Hensley [R] | Sen. Frank Niceley [R] |
Sen. Mark Pody [R] | Sen. Edward Jackson [R] | Sen. Becky Massey [R] | Sen. Paul Rose [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-27 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - Senate - SENATE HEALTH AND WELFARE COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - Senate - SENATE GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Health and Welfare Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - Senate - SENATE HEALTH AND WELFARE COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - Senate - SENATE GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Health and Welfare Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-18 | Effective date(s) 05/11/2021 | |
2021-05-18 | Pub. Ch. 373 | |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2021-04-30 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2021-04-27 | House | Passed H., Ayes 91, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2021-04-27 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2021-04-01 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 32, Nays 0 |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 for 3/29/2021 |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/24/2021 |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Health and Welfare Committee |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Placed on Senate Government Operations Committee calendar for 3/17/2021 |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Government Operations Committee |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0750 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-18 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 373