TN SB1276 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-05-03 - Companion House Bill substituted
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, extends the nursing home annual assessment fee to June 30, 2022. - Amends TCA Title 71.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 71, relative to the nursing home assessment.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-03SenateCompanion House Bill substituted
2021-04-29SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar for 5/3/2021
2021-04-27SenateRecommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
2021-04-21SenatePlaced on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/27/2021
2021-04-13SenateRecommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0
2021-04-07SenatePlaced on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 4/13/2021
2021-03-31SenateAction deferred in Senate Health and Welfare Committee to 4/7/2021
2021-03-25SenatePlaced on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/31/2021
2021-02-22SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Health and Welfare Committee
2021-02-11SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2021-02-11SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0556 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-03 - Passed Senate, Ayes 32, Nays 0

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback