TN SB1268 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-09 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
Pending: Senate Finance, Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-09 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
Pending: Senate Finance, Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, increases portion of state-shared sales tax revenue for cities and counties by .5 percent; divides the portion equally between cities and counties; decreases by .5 percent the portion of revenue distributed to the general fund. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 6.
Title
As introduced, increases portion of state-shared sales tax revenue for cities and counties by .5 percent; divides the portion equally between cities and counties; decreases by .5 percent the portion of revenue distributed to the general fund. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 6.
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Norris [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-09 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 5/9/2017 |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 5/8/2017 |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 5/3/2017 |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 5/3/2017 |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 5/2/2017 |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Refer to Senate Finance, Ways & Means Committee w/ neutral recommendation |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Placed on Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee calendar for 3/15/2017 |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Refer to Senate Revenue Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1069 (Crossfiled) 2017-05-08 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee