TN SB1266 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-08 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State & Local Government Committee
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-08 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State & Local Government Committee
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, extends, from 10 to 15 days, the period in which the state fire marshal has to rule on an appeal involving a conflict between a city and county over a building or fire code issue involving a county building located within a city. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 3, Part 7; Title 5; Title 6; Title 13, Chapter 7; Title 13, Chapter 19, Part 1 and Title 68, Chapter 120.
Title
As introduced, extends, from 10 to 15 days, the period in which the state fire marshal has to rule on an appeal involving a conflict between a city and county over a building or fire code issue involving a county building located within a city. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 3, Part 7; Title 5; Title 6; Title 13, Chapter 7; Title 13, Chapter 19, Part 1 and Title 68, Chapter 120.
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Pody [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-08 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State & Local Government Committee |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0080 (Crossfiled) 2019-01-28 - P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.