TN SB1266 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-11 - Pub. Ch. 98
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-11 - Pub. Ch. 98
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, limits the TRA's jurisdiction over an investor-owned electric power company serving Tennessee customers on the western side of the Mississippi River to hearing complaints alleging certain levels of service and rate violations and granting appropriate relief. - Amends TCA Title 65, Chapter 4, Part 1.
Title
As enacted, limits the TRA's jurisdiction over an investor-owned electric power company serving Tennessee customers on the western side of the Mississippi River to hearing complaints alleging certain levels of service and rate violations and granting appropriate relief. - Amends TCA Title 65, Chapter 4, Part 1.
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Norris [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-13 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - Senate - SENATE COMMERCE AND LABOR COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - Senate - SENATE COMMERCE AND LABOR COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-11 | Pub. Ch. 98 | |
2017-04-11 | Effective date(s) 07/01/2017 | |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2017-03-22 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2017-03-20 | House | Passed H., Ayes 95, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2017-03-20 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2017-03-16 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 33, Nays 0 |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 calendar for 3/13/2017 |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/7/2017 |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee to 3/7/2017 |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 2/28/2017 |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0339 (Crossfiled) 2017-04-11 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 98