TN SB1264 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-29 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, specifies that each local board of education of a local education agency and governing body of a public charter school has the sole authority to select a mascot for the respective school; prohibits a state agency from interfering with such authority. - Amends TCA Section 4-1-405; Section 4-1-412 and Title 49.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Section 4-1-405; Section 4-1-412 and Title 49, relative to schools.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-29SenateAssigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee
2023-03-22SenatePlaced on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/29/2023
2023-03-22SenateAction deferred in Senate Education Committee to 3/29/2023
2023-03-15SenatePlaced on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/22/2023
2023-03-15SenateAction deferred in Senate Education Committee to 3/22/2023
2023-03-08SenatePlaced on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/15/2023
2023-02-06SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee
2023-02-02SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2023-01-31SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB1405 (Crossfiled) 2024-01-30 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c K-12 Subcommittee of Education Administration

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback