TN SB1261 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-17 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-17 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires each local board of education and charter school governing body to adopt a comprehensive code of conduct for each school under the authority of the board or governing body that describes the types of behavior expected from all persons entering on school grounds. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 6.
Title
As introduced, requires each local board of education and charter school governing body to adopt a comprehensive code of conduct for each school under the authority of the board or governing body that describes the types of behavior expected from all persons entering on school grounds. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 6.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-17 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 4/17/2019 |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Education Committee to 4/17/2019 |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 4/10/2019 |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Reset on Final calendar of Senate Education Committee |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/20/2019 |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Education Committee to 3/20/2019 |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 2/27/2019 |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0399 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-10 - Taken off notice for cal. in Education