TN SB1257 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 14-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/22/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, enacts the "Human Life Protection Act," which bans abortion in this state effective upon the U.S. Supreme Court overturning Roe v. Wade or amending the U.S. Constitution to allow states to prohibit abortion; creates exception for situations where the abortion is necessary to prevent the death of pregnant woman or prevent serious risk of substantial and irreversible impairment of major bodily function; prohibits prosecution of a woman upon whom an abortion is performed or attempted. - Amends TCA Section 9-4-5116; Title 37, Chapter 10, Part 3; Title 39, Chapter 13, Part 2; Title 39, Chapter 15, Part 2; Title 39, Chapter 13, Part 1; Title 63, Chapter 9; Title 63, Chapter 6; Title 68 and Title 71, Chapter 5.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, enacts the "Human Life Protection Act," which bans abortion in this state effective upon the U.S. Supreme Court overturning Roe v. Wade or amending the U.S. Constitution to allow states to prohibit abortion; creates exception for situations where the abortion is necessary to prevent the death of pregnant woman or prevent serious risk of substantial and irreversible impairment of major bodily function; prohibits prosecution of a woman upon whom an abortion is performed or attempted. - Amends TCA Section 9-4-5116; Title 37, Chapter 10, Part 3; Title 39, Chapter 13, Part 2; Title 39, Chapter 15, Part 2; Title 39, Chapter 13, Part 1; Title 63, Chapter 9; Title 63, Chapter 6; Title 68 and Title 71, Chapter 5.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-18SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/22/2019
2019-04-18SenateSenate Reset on calendar for 4/22/19
2019-04-16SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/18/2019
2019-04-09SenateRecommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 2 PNV 0
2019-04-03SenatePlaced on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/9/2019
2019-04-02SenateAction deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 4/9/2019
2019-03-27SenatePlaced on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/2/2019
2019-02-11SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
2019-02-07SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2019-02-07SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB1029 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-18 - H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/22/2019

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback