TN SB1257 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-01 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 459
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, authorizes cities incorporated under the general law city manager commission charter to charge fire fees for the construction and maintenance of municipal fire departments. - Amends TCA Title 6, Chapter 19.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, authorizes cities incorporated under the general law city manager commission charter to charge fire fees for the construction and maintenance of municipal fire departments. - Amends TCA Title 6, Chapter 19.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-01 Comp. became Pub. Ch. 459
2017-05-09SenateCompanion House Bill substituted
2017-05-09SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar 2 calendar for 5/9/2017
2017-05-09SenateRecommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
2017-05-08SenatePlaced on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 5/9/2017
2017-05-03SenateAction deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 5/8/2017
2017-05-03SenateAction deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 5/15/2017
2017-05-03SenatePlaced on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 5/3/2017
2017-05-02SenateAction deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 5/3/2017
2017-05-01SenatePlaced on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 5/2/2017
2017-04-11SenateRecommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0
2017-04-05SenatePlaced on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 4/11/2017
2017-04-05SenateAction deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 4/11/2017
2017-04-04SenatePlaced on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 4/5/2017
2017-04-04SenateAction deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 4/5/2017
2017-03-30SenatePlaced on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 4/4/2017
2017-03-30SenateRule #83(8) Suspended, to be heard in S. S&L Govt. Comm. 4-4-17
2017-02-13SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee
2017-02-09SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2017-02-09SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0488 (Crossfiled) 2017-06-01 - Pub. Ch. 459

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback