TN SB1257 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-02-21 - P2C, ref. to S. H&W Comm.
Pending: Senate Health and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, specifies that counties are only responsible for in-patient evaluations for a maximum of five days and in-patient treatment for a maximum of 10 days regarding individuals charged with misdemeanor offenses. - Amends TCA Title 33, Chapter 7, Part 3.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, specifies that counties are only responsible for in-patient evaluations for a maximum of five days and in-patient treatment for a maximum of 10 days regarding individuals charged with misdemeanor offenses. - Amends TCA Title 33, Chapter 7, Part 3.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-02-21SenateP2C, ref. to S. H&W Comm.
2013-02-14SenateIntro., P1C.
2013-02-13SenateFiled for intro.

Same As/Similar To

HB1183 (Crossfiled) 2013-03-26 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in: Local Government Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback