TN SB1257 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-01-18 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of Trans. Com.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, authorizes licensing of certain all terrain vehicles (ATVs); allows local governments to authorize use of such ATVs on certain public highways. - Amends TCA Title 55.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, authorizes licensing of certain all terrain vehicles (ATVs); allows local governments to authorize use of such ATVs on certain public highways. - Amends TCA Title 55.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2012-01-18 Assigned to Gen. Sub of Trans. Com.
2012-01-12 Placed on S. T&S Comm. cal. for 1/18/2012
2011-04-20 Action def. in S. Trans. Comm. to 1st cal. of 2012
2011-04-13 Placed on S. Trans Comm. cal. for 4/20/2011
2011-04-13 Action Def. in S. Trans Comm. to 4/20/2011
2011-04-07 Placed on S. Trans Comm. cal. for 4/13/2011
2011-02-23 P2C, ref. to S. Trans Comm.
2011-02-17 Intro., P1C.
2011-02-16 Filed for intro.

Same As/Similar To

HB1621 (Crossfiled) 2011-04-26 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Transportation Subcommittee of Transportation Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback