TN SB1248 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-09 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
Pending: Senate Finance, Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-09 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
Pending: Senate Finance, Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, creates 51 additional assistant district attorney general, secretarial, victim-witness coordinator, and criminal investigator positions effective October 1, 2017, in districts to be recommended by the district attorneys general conference; requires a report of the recommended districts be filed with the speakers of the senate and house of representatives. - Amends TCA Title 16, Chapter 2.
Title
As introduced, creates 51 additional assistant district attorney general, secretarial, victim-witness coordinator, and criminal investigator positions effective October 1, 2017, in districts to be recommended by the district attorneys general conference; requires a report of the recommended districts be filed with the speakers of the senate and house of representatives. - Amends TCA Title 16, Chapter 2.
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Norris [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-14 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-09 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 5/9/2017 |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 5/8/2017 |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 5/3/2017 |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 5/3/2017 |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 5/2/2017 |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/14/2017 |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0699 (Crossfiled) 2017-05-08 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee