TN SB1248 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on April 17 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-13 - Vetoed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on April 17 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-13 - Vetoed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires a person who records cruelty to animals as committed against livestock to report such violation and submit any unedited photographs or video recordings to law enforcement authorities within 24 hours of the photograph's or recording’s creation. - Amends TCA Title 39 and Title 44.
Title
As introduced, requires a person who records cruelty to animals as committed against livestock to report such violation and submit any unedited photographs or video recordings to law enforcement authorities within 24 hours of the photograph's or recording’s creation. - Amends TCA Title 39 and Title 44.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-17 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 50 N: 43 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-17 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PREVIOUS QUESTION PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 64 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-17 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PREVIOUS QUESTION PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 46 N: 46 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-17 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REREFER TO COMMITTEE PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 35 N: 53 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-17 - House - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO CONSIDER AMENDMENT # 6 BY Lynn PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 53 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-17 - House - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO CONSIDER AMENDMENT # 5 BY Rich PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 44 N: 44 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-17 - House - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT AMENDMENT # 4 BY Todd PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 20 N: 71 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-17 - House - FLOOR VOTE: LAY ON THE TABLE MOTION TO ADOPT AMENDMENT # 4 BY Todd PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 43 N: 47 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-17 - House - FLOOR VOTE: LAY ON THE TABLE MOTION TO ADOPT AMENDMENT # 2 BY Lundberg PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 45 N: 42 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-16 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 22 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-16 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: LAY ON THE TABLE MOTION TO ADOPT AMEND# 2 BY Norris (Y: 17 N: 10 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-02 - Senate - S. JUD COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-17 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PREVIOUS QUESTION PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 64 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-17 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PREVIOUS QUESTION PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 46 N: 46 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-17 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REREFER TO COMMITTEE PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 35 N: 53 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-17 - House - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO CONSIDER AMENDMENT # 6 BY Lynn PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 53 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-17 - House - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO CONSIDER AMENDMENT # 5 BY Rich PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 44 N: 44 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-17 - House - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT AMENDMENT # 4 BY Todd PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 20 N: 71 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-17 - House - FLOOR VOTE: LAY ON THE TABLE MOTION TO ADOPT AMENDMENT # 4 BY Todd PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 43 N: 47 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-17 - House - FLOOR VOTE: LAY ON THE TABLE MOTION TO ADOPT AMENDMENT # 2 BY Lundberg PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 45 N: 42 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-16 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 22 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-16 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: LAY ON THE TABLE MOTION TO ADOPT AMEND# 2 BY Norris (Y: 17 N: 10 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-02 - Senate - S. JUD COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-13 | House | Vetoed by Governor |
2013-05-03 | House | Transmitted to Gov. for action. |
2013-05-01 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2013-05-01 | House | Signed by S. Speaker |
2013-04-23 | House | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2013-04-17 | House | Passed H., Ayes 50, Nays 43 |
2013-04-17 | House | Motion to consider am. 5-6 failed |
2013-04-17 | House | Am. 4 tabled. |
2013-04-17 | House | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 3 - HA0533) |
2013-04-17 | House | Am. 2 tabled. |
2013-04-17 | House | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 1 - HA0205) |
2013-04-17 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Passed S. as am., Ayes 22, Nays 9 |
2013-04-16 | Senate | S. Am. 2 tabled |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 4/16/2013 |
2013-04-11 | Senate | S. Reset on Cal. for 4/16/2013 |
2013-04-11 | Senate | S. adopted am.(Amendment 1 of 0 - SA0378) |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 4/11/2013 |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. Cal. Comm. Ayes 6, Nays 1 PNV 1 |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 4/2/2013 |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 4/2/2013 |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 3/26/2013 |
2013-02-21 | Senate | P2C, ref. to S. Jud Comm. |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Intro., P1C. |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1191 (Crossfiled) 2013-04-17 - Comp. SB subst.