TN SB1248 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-04 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of S&L Govt Com.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-04 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of S&L Govt Com.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires development and periodical offering of seminars to state employees on financial planning and utilization of state benefits as part of such financial plan. - Amends TCA Title 8.
Title
As introduced, requires development and periodical offering of seminars to state employees on financial planning and utilization of state benefits as part of such financial plan. - Amends TCA Title 8.
Sponsors
Sen. Ken Yager [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-04 | Assigned to Gen. Sub of S&L Govt Com. | |
2011-02-23 | P2C, ref. to S. S&L Govt. Comm. | |
2011-02-17 | Intro., P1C. | |
2011-02-16 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1452 (Crossfiled) 2011-03-01 - Assigned to s/c General Sub of S&LG
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB1248&ga=107 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/107/Bill/SB1248.pdf |