TN SB1244 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-03 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 196
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-03 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 196
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires an adjudicating court to inform a child of the need to file a motion for expunction of a juvenile record; requires the administrative office of the courts to create a motion that can be completed by a child; requires juvenile court clerks to make the model expunction motion available to all children. - Amends TCA Section 37-1-153.
Title
As enacted, requires an adjudicating court to inform a child of the need to file a motion for expunction of a juvenile record; requires the administrative office of the courts to create a motion that can be completed by a child; requires juvenile court clerks to make the model expunction motion available to all children. - Amends TCA Section 37-1-153.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-28 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-03 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 196 | |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/10/2017 |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/28/2017 |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0577 (Crossfiled) 2017-05-03 - Pub. Ch. 196