TN SB1241 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on June 14 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-14 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 475
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on June 14 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-14 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 475
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, increases penalty for unlawfully possessing a firearm with a prior conviction for a felony involving use of force or violence from Class C felony to Class B felony; increases from Class D felony to Class C felony penalty for person unlawfully possessing firearm with prior felony drug offense. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 13 and Title 40, Chapter 35, Part 3.
Title
As enacted, increases penalty for unlawfully possessing a firearm with a prior conviction for a felony involving use of force or violence from Class C felony to Class B felony; increases from Class D felony to Class C felony penalty for person unlawfully possessing firearm with prior felony drug offense. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 13 and Title 40, Chapter 35, Part 3.
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Norris [R] | Sen. Doug Overbey [R] | Sen. Joseph Hensley [R] | Sen. Edward Jackson [R] |
Sen. John Stevens [R] | Sen. Reginald Tate [D] | Sen. Jim Tracy [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-09 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS, AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 10, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 8, Nays 1 PNV 0 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 8, Nays 1 PNV 0 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-14 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 475 | |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar 2 calendar for 5/9/2017 |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 10, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 5/9/2017 |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 5/8/2017 |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 5/3/2017 |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Rule #83(8) Suspended, to be heard in S. FW&M Comm 5-3-17 |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 8, Nays 1 PNV 0 |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/28/2017 |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/28/2017 |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/21/2017 |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0452 (Crossfiled) 2017-06-14 - Pub. Ch. 475