TN SB1241 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-27 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. Ed. Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-27 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. Ed. Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, prohibits operation and maintenance of a campus police force by an institution of higher education that otherwise has statutory authority to operate a campus police force, if the institution requires a student organization to allow any student enrolled at the institution to participate in the organization regardless of the student's beliefs or status. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Title
As introduced, prohibits operation and maintenance of a campus police force by an institution of higher education that otherwise has statutory authority to operate a campus police force, if the institution requires a student organization to allow any student enrolled at the institution to participate in the organization regardless of the student's beliefs or status. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Sponsors
Sen. Mae Beavers [R] | Sen. Mark Pody [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-27 | Senate | Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. Ed. Comm. |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Placed on S. Ed. Comm. cal. for 3/27/2013 |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Action Def. in S. Ed. Comm. to 3/27/2013 |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Placed on S. Ed. Comm. cal. for 3/20/2013 |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Action Def. in S. Ed. Comm. to 3/20/2013 |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Placed on S. Ed. Comm. cal. for 3/13/2013 |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Action Def. in S. Ed. Comm. to 3/13/2013 |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Placed on S. Ed. Comm. cal. for 3/6/2013 |
2013-02-21 | Senate | P2C, ref. to S. Ed. Comm. |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Intro., P1C. |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1150 (Crossfiled) 2013-03-26 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Education Subcommittee of Education Committee
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB1241&ga=108 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/108/Bill/SB1241.pdf |