TN SB1240 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-05 - Effective date(s) 04/30/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-05 - Effective date(s) 04/30/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, directs the department to provide career and technical education opportunities for students in middle school; requires an LEA to provide students in seventh or eighth grade with information on available career and technical education programs upon administering a career aptitude assessment. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 49, relative to career and technical education.
Sponsors
Sen. Rusty Crowe [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-19 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-05 | Effective date(s) 04/30/2021 | |
2021-05-05 | Pub. Ch. 271 | |
2021-04-30 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2021-04-21 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2021-04-19 | House | Passed H., Ayes 92, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2021-04-19 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2021-04-15 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 29, Nays 0 |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 for 4/14/2021 |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 4/7/2021 |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Education Committee to 4/7/2021 |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/31/2021 |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1446 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-05 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 271