TN SB1235 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 476
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 476
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, designates the fiscal review committee as a joint office of the general assembly; revises other provisions governing the committee. - Amends TCA Title 3; Title 4; Title 8; Title 9 and Title 12.
Title
As enacted, designates the fiscal review committee as a joint office of the general assembly; revises other provisions governing the committee. - Amends TCA Title 3; Title 4; Title 8; Title 9 and Title 12.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-10 - Senate - SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 2 PNV 0 (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-29 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 476 | |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/22/2019 |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar for 4/22/19 |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/18/2019 |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 2 PNV 0 |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 4/10/2019 |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 4/10/2019 |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 4/9/2019 |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/19/2019 |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 3/19/2019 |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/12/2019 |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1233 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-29 - Pub. Ch. 476