TN SB1233 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-10 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. S&L Govt. Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-10 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. S&L Govt. Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, subject to a county legislative body approving the exemption, expands the property tax exemptions to include single-family dwellings owned and maintained by a 501(c)(3) corporation formed by a religious institution to be used as part of the ministry of the religious institution. - Amends TCA Title 67 and Title 68.
Title
As introduced, subject to a county legislative body approving the exemption, expands the property tax exemptions to include single-family dwellings owned and maintained by a 501(c)(3) corporation formed by a religious institution to be used as part of the ministry of the religious institution. - Amends TCA Title 67 and Title 68.
Sponsors
Sen. Jack Johnson [R] | Sen. Mark Pody [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-10 | Senate | Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. S&L Govt. Comm. |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Placed on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 4/10/2013 |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Action Def. in S. S&L Govt. Comm. to 4/9/2013 |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Placed on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 4/2/2013 |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Action Def. in S. S&L Govt. Comm. to 4/9/2013 |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Placed on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 3/27/2013 |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Action Def. in S. S&L Gov. Comm. to 3/27/2013 |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Placed on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 3/26/2013 |
2013-02-21 | Senate | P2C, ref. to S. S&L Govt. Comm. |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Intro., P1C. |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB0852 (Crossfiled) 2013-04-09 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB1233&ga=108 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/108/Bill/SB1233.pdf |