TN SB1232 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-22 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 362
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-22 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 362
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, renames the "Water Environmental Health Act" to be the "Water and Wastewater Operator Certification Act"; revises various provisions of the Act. - Amends TCA Title 62 and Title 68, Chapter 221, Part 9.
Title
As enacted, renames the "Water Environmental Health Act" to be the "Water and Wastewater Operator Certification Act"; revises various provisions of the Act. - Amends TCA Title 62 and Title 68, Chapter 221, Part 9.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-18 - Senate - S. GOVT. OPS. COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-20 - Senate - S. ENERGY, AGRICULTURE AND NATURAL RESOURCES : Recommended for passage - refer to: S. FW&M Comm. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-20 - Senate - S. E,A&NR COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. FW&M Comm. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-20 - Senate - S. ENERGY, AGRICULTURE AND NATURAL RESOURCES : Recommended for passage - refer to: S. FW&M Comm. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-20 - Senate - S. E,A&NR COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. FW&M Comm. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-22 | Senate | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 362 |
2013-04-22 | Senate | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 1 - SA0554) |
2013-04-19 | Senate | Comp. HB Subst (sends SB to dead bill file) |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 4/19/2013 |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Placed on S. Cal. Comm. cal. for 4/18/2013 |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. Cal. Comm. Ayes 7, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Placed on S. Govt. Ops. Comm. cal. for 4/18/2013 |
2013-04-18 | Senate | R/S #83(8) to be heard in S. F,W&M Comm. 4/18/2013 |
2013-04-18 | Senate | R/S #83(8) to be heard in S. Gov. Ops. Comm. |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Ref to: S. Govt. Ops. Comm. |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 4/17/2013 |
2013-04-17 | Senate | R/S #83(8) to be heard in S. F,W&M Comm. 4/17/2013 |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: S. FW&M Comm. |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Placed on S. E,A&NR Comm. cal. for 3/20/2013 |
2013-02-21 | Senate | P2C, ref. to S. E,A&NR Comm. |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Intro., P1C. |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1066 (Crossfiled) 2013-05-22 - Pub. Ch. 362