TN SB1229 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-05 - Effective date(s) 05/03/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-05 - Effective date(s) 05/03/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires an LEA or public charter school to notify a student's parent or guardian prior to commencing instruction of a sexual orientation or gender identity curriculum; permits a parent or guardian to excuse the parent's or guardian's student from a sexual orientation or gender identity curriculum, and prohibits the LEA or charter school from penalizing an excused student. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 6, Part 13.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 49, Chapter 6, Part 13, relative to curriculum.
Sponsors
Sen. Paul Rose [R] | Sen. Edward Jackson [R] | Sen. Mark Pody [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-14 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 64 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 24 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 24 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-05 | Effective date(s) 05/03/2021 | |
2021-05-05 | Pub. Ch. 281 | |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2021-04-21 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2021-04-14 | House | Passed H., Ayes 64, Nays 23, PNV 0 |
2021-04-14 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2021-04-08 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 24, Nays 6 |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/5/2021 |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/24/2021 |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0529 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-05 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 281