TN SB1224 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-14 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 485
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-14 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 485
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, adds "businesses owned by persons with disabilities" to the Tennessee Minority-Owned, Woman-Owned and Small Business Procurement and Contracting Act; requires that the annual report made by the chief procurement officer concerning the awarding of purchases to minority-owned business, woman-owned business, service-disabled veteran-owned business, or small business and the total value of awards made also include the total dollar amount of purchases awarded to all businesses in this state. - Amends TCA Title 4 and Title 12.
Title
As enacted, adds "businesses owned by persons with disabilities" to the Tennessee Minority-Owned, Woman-Owned and Small Business Procurement and Contracting Act; requires that the annual report made by the chief procurement officer concerning the awarding of purchases to minority-owned business, woman-owned business, service-disabled veteran-owned business, or small business and the total value of awards made also include the total dollar amount of purchases awarded to all businesses in this state. - Amends TCA Title 4 and Title 12.
Sponsors
Sen. Becky Massey [R] | Sen. Ken Yager [R] | Sen. Doug Overbey [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-09 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS, AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - Senate - SENATE STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - Senate - SENATE STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-14 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 485 | |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar 2 calendar for 5/9/2017 |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 5/9/2017 |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 5/8/2017 |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 5/3/2017 |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 5/3/2017 |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 5/2/2017 |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Re-refer to Senate FW&M Comm. |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/17/2017 |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 4/5/2017 |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 4/5/2017 |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 4/4/2017 |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 4/4/2017 |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/28/2017 |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1276 (Crossfiled) 2017-06-14 - Pub. Ch. 485