TN SB1223 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-04 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 229
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-04 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 229
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, authorizes an LEA to remove a student from the regular school program without assigning the student to an alternative school or alternative program if the student was suspended or expelled for certain offenses that may threaten the safety of persons attending or assigned to the regular school program and the alternative school or alternative program is located on the same grounds as the regular school program. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 6.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 49, Chapter 6, relative to alternative education.
Sponsors
Sen. Paul Rose [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-31 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-04 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 229 | |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar for 4/7/2021 |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/31/2021 |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0890 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-04 - Effective date(s) 4/22/2021