TN SB1222 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-04-18 - Sponsor change.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, authorizes a juvenile court to order a child who has requested the expunction of the child's juvenile court records to undergo a mental health evaluation and use the evaluation results to assist in determining whether expunction would serve the best interest of the child and the community. - Amends TCA Title 37.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 37, relative to juvenile records.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-04-18SenateSponsor change.
2023-02-06SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
2023-02-02SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2023-01-31SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0267 (Crossfiled) 2023-04-19 - Sponsor(s) withdrawn.

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback