TN SB1222 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-01 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce & Labor Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, requires healthcare providers and healthcare facilities prior to providing healthcare services to inform a patient whether any health insurance policy carried by the patient is accepted, and whether the services provided will be considered in-network; provides an exception for patients experiencing medical emergencies. - Amends TCA Title 8; Title 33; Title 56; Title 63 and Title 68.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, requires healthcare providers and healthcare facilities prior to providing healthcare services to inform a patient whether any health insurance policy carried by the patient is accepted, and whether the services provided will be considered in-network; provides an exception for patients experiencing medical emergencies. - Amends TCA Title 8; Title 33; Title 56; Title 63 and Title 68.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-01SenateAssigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce & Labor Committee
2019-02-11SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
2019-02-07SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2019-02-06SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB1376 (Crossfiled) 2019-03-27 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Life & Health Insurance Subcommittee of Insurance Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback