TN SB1215 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-03 - Pub. Ch. 228
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, enacts the "Tennessee Broadband Accessibility Act." - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 3, Part 7; Title 7, Chapter 59, Part 3; Title 65, Chapter 25 and Title 67, Chapter 4, Part 20.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, enacts the "Tennessee Broadband Accessibility Act." - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 3, Part 7; Title 7, Chapter 59, Part 3; Title 65, Chapter 25 and Title 67, Chapter 4, Part 20.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-10 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 93 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS, AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - Senate - SENATE COMMERCE AND LABOR COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-03 Pub. Ch. 228
2017-05-03 Effective date(s) 04/24/2017
2017-04-24SenateSigned by Governor.
2017-04-13SenateTransmitted to Governor for action.
2017-04-12HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2017-04-12SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2017-04-12SenateEnrolled and ready for signatures
2017-04-10HousePassed H., Ayes 93, Nays 4, PNV 0
2017-04-10HouseAm. withdrawn. (Amendment 2 - HA0335)
2017-04-10HouseAm. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0159)
2017-04-10HouseSubst. for comp. HB.
2017-04-06HouseRcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
2017-04-04SenateEngrossed; ready for transmission to House
2017-04-03SenateSponsor(s) Added.
2017-04-03SenatePassed Senate as amended, Ayes 31, Nays 0
2017-04-03SenateSenate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0114)
2017-03-30SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/3/2017
2017-03-28SenateSponsor(s) Added.
2017-03-28SenateRecommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
2017-03-22SenatePlaced on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 3/28/2017
2017-03-17SenateRefer to Senate Finance, Ways & Means Committee
2017-03-17SenateRecalled from Senate Calendar Committee
2017-03-14SenateRecommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0
2017-03-08SenatePlaced on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/14/2017
2017-03-08SenateSponsor(s) Added.
2017-02-13SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
2017-02-09SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2017-02-09SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0529 (Crossfiled) 2017-05-03 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 228

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback