TN SB1209 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-13 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-13 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, authorizes certain cancer patients to possess and use full extract cannabis oil that is intended to be ingested orally or used topically if certain criteria are met and documentation maintained. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 4; Title 63 and Title 68.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 4; Title 63 and Title 68, relative to cannabis oil for medical use.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-13 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/13/2021 |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/16/2021 |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0239 (Crossfiled) 2022-02-01 - Sponsor(s) Added.