TN SB1206 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-09 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 229
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-09 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 229
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, extends the authority to barter for healthcare services if the patient is not covered by health insurance to all healthcare professionals instead of only physicians. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 8; Title 33; Title 56; Title 63; Title 68 and Title 71.
Title
As enacted, extends the authority to barter for healthcare services if the patient is not covered by health insurance to all healthcare professionals instead of only physicians. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 8; Title 33; Title 56; Title 63; Title 68 and Title 71.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-02 - Senate - SENATE COMMERCE AND LABOR COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-09 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 229 | |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/15/2019 |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar for 4/15/2019 |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/11/2019 |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 4/2/2019 |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0655 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-09 - Pub. Ch. 229