TN SB1205 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-05 - Re-refer to Senate Cal. Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-05 - Re-refer to Senate Cal. Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, prohibits certain health insurance issuers, managed health insurance issuers, pharmacy benefits managers, or other third-party payers from taking certain actions against entities participating in the federal 340B drug discount program. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 56 and Title 71.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4; Title 56 and Title 71, relative to 340B entities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-30 - Senate - SENATE COMMERCE AND LABOR COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 1 PNV 0 (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-05 | Senate | Re-refer to Senate Cal. Comm. |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 5/5/2021 |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar 2 for 5/4/2021 |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Senate Reset to heel of the last calendar of 2021 |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 5/3/2021 |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 1 PNV 0 |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/30/2021 |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1348 (Crossfiled) 2021-04-01 - Received from House, Passed on First Consideration