TN SB1202 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-06 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of S. C,L&A Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-06 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of S. C,L&A Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, adds a horticulturist and a person with ornamental lawn and turf experience to the pest control board. - Amends TCA Title 62, Chapter 21.
Title
As introduced, adds a horticulturist and a person with ornamental lawn and turf experience to the pest control board. - Amends TCA Title 62, Chapter 21.
Sponsors
Sen. Ken Yager [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-06 | Assigned to Gen. Sub of S. C,L&A Comm. | |
2011-02-23 | P2C, ref. to S. C,L&A Comm. | |
2011-02-17 | Intro., P1C. | |
2011-02-16 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB0905 (Crossfiled) 2011-03-02 - Assigned to s/c Commerce Subcommittee
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB1202&ga=107 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/107/Bill/SB1202.pdf |