TN SB1197 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-13 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 802
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-13 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 802
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, prohibits the state, a political subdivision, or a public official from prohibiting or imposing additional restrictions on the lawful operations of a church or religious organization during a state of emergency, major disaster, or natural disaster; restricts a county health officer from issuing an order closing or limiting the operations of a church or religious organization for purposes of worship services. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 5; Title 8; Title 58 and Title 68.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4; Title 5; Title 8; Title 58 and Title 68, relative to public officials.
Sponsors
Sen. Janince Bowling [R] | Sen. Dawn White [R] | Sen. Rusty Crowe [R] | Sen. Frank Niceley [R] |
Sen. Mark Pody [R] | Sen. Shane Reeves [R] | Sen. Kerry Roberts [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-09 - Senate - SENATE HEALTH AND WELFARE COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 1 PNV 0 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - Senate - SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Health and Welfare Committee Ayes 5, Nays 2 PNV 2 (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - Senate - SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Health and Welfare Committee Ayes 5, Nays 2 PNV 2 (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-13 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 802 | |
2022-03-25 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 3/24/2022 |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 1 PNV 0 |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/9/2022 |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Health and Welfare Committee to 3/9/2022 |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/2/2022 |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Health and Welfare Committee to 3/2/2022 |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 2/23/2022 |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Health and Welfare Committee Ayes 5, Nays 2 PNV 2 |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 4/13/2021 |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Rule #83(8) Suspended, to be heard in S. State & Local Government Comm. 4-13-21 |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Deferred to Summer Study |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 4/6/2021 |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1137 (Crossfiled) 2022-04-13 - Effective date(s) 04/08/2022