TN SB1194 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-03 - Pub. Ch. 227
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-03 - Pub. Ch. 227
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, removes licensure requirement for persons whose occupation or practice is confined solely to shampooing. - Amends TCA Title 62, Chapter 3 and Title 62, Chapter 4.
Title
As enacted, removes licensure requirement for persons whose occupation or practice is confined solely to shampooing. - Amends TCA Title 62, Chapter 3 and Title 62, Chapter 4.
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Norris [R] | Sen. Kerry Roberts [R] | Sen. Janince Bowling [R] | Sen. Dolores Gresham [R] |
Sen. Brian Kelsey [R] | Sen. John Stevens [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-17 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 84 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - Senate - SENATE COMMERCE AND LABOR COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - Senate - SENATE COMMERCE AND LABOR COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-03 | Pub. Ch. 227 | |
2017-05-03 | Effective date(s) 04/28/2017 | |
2017-04-28 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2017-04-19 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2017-04-17 | House | Passed H., Ayes 84, Nays 5, PNV 0 |
2017-04-17 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2017-03-20 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 26, Nays 0 |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 3/16/2017 |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/7/2017 |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee to 3/7/2017 |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 2/28/2017 |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0306 (Crossfiled) 2017-05-03 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 227